Financial history CROYDON JUBILEE CHURCH

Charity number: 1146703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £449.11k £367.39k £308.86k £314.97k £414.09k
Total expenditure £453.44k £325.31k £289.91k £257.11k £384.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £63.48k £19.23k N/A N/A