CHILDREN'S OBESITY & ORAL HEALTH EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING DIETARY & ORAL HEALTH EDUCATION SESSIONS FOR CHILDREN AGED PRE-SCHOOL TO THE AGE OF 11. THE SESSIONS WILL COVER UNDERSTANDING THE IMPORTANCE OF GOOD DENTAL HEALTH; EDUCATING CHILDREN ON WHAT CAUSES TOOTH DECAY; ENCOURAGING DAILY DENTAL CARE. THE SESSIONS WILL USE A MIX OF GAMES, COLOURING SHEETS, LEARNING DENTAL HEALTH VOCABULARY, DISCUSSING FOODS AND CAUSES OF DENTAL DECAY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 15 August 2012: Standard registration
- CDHE (Working name)
- CHILDREN'S DENTAL HEALTH EDUCATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TINA CATHERINE BELL | Chair | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142 | £165 | £208 | £264 | £338 | |
|
Total expenditure | £137 | £127 | £145 | £196 | £260 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 28/12/2014 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO IMPROVE PRESERVE & PROTECT THE ORAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PREVENTION AND MANAGEMENT OF OBESITY IN YOUNG CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF REGIONAL SUPPORT NETWORKS VIA CHILDREN CENTRES AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS AND OTHER MEDIA. TO DO SUCH OTHER THINGS AS MAY BE INCIDENTAL, CONDUCIVE OR ANCILLARY TO THE ATTAINMENT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Waterford Green
Ashington
NE63 0DD
- Phone:
- 07500861133
- Email:
- info@coohe.org.uk
- Website:
-
coohe.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window