Financial history VICTORIA PARK BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1146557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £76.65k £78.55k £109.14k £103.12k £111.91k
Total expenditure £62.68k £30.45k £243.25k £341.89k £70.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A