A E DICKSON CHARITY FOR GOOSNARGH CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AUGMENTATION OF THE PARISHIONERS OF THE CHURCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 August 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 April 1974: Standard registration
- 08 November 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/08/2006 | 20/08/2007 | 20/08/2008 | 20/08/2009 | 20/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21 | £28 | £100 | £35 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 August 2010 | 23 August 2011 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 August 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 August 2009 | 22 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 August 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 August 2008 | 01 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 August 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 20 AUGUST 1973
Charitable objects
AUGMENTING THE STIPEND OF THE INCUMBENT OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY GOOSNARGH AND IN DEFRAYING THE EXPENSES OF HIS OFFICE
Area of benefit
ECCLESIACTICAL PARISH OF GOOSNARGH NEAR PRESTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window