MARKET SECURITIES CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Charity are in the UK and Overseas: - to support children in poverty - to support high impact charities in the areas of education, enterprise & health - to support charities in the fields of medical research, environmental projects, child support, medical support, education, relief of poverty and general support to the under-privileged
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- France
- Senegal
- United States
Governance
- 23 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER KOPF | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAIN FELLOUS | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
KAMAL HAIDER | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BARR | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.05k | £19.42k | £491 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.86k | £19.16k | £2.64k | £2.91k | £2.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2025 | 717 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
FOR ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BUT IN PARTICULAR A) SUPPORTING CHILDREN IN POVERTY BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS B) SUPPORTING HIGH IMPACT CHARITIES IN THE AREAS OF EDUCATION ENTERPRISE & HEALTH BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS C) SUPPORTING CHARITIES IN THE FIELDS OF MEDICAL RESEARCH ENVIROMENTAL PROJECTS CHILD SUPPORT MEDICAL SUPPORT EDUCATION RELIEF OF POVERTY AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE UNDERPRIVILEGED BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7F NORTH BUILDING
55 BAKER STREET
LONDON
W1U 8EW
- Phone:
- 02071500766
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window