Accounts and annual returns RUNNYMEDE DEMENTIA CARERS SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1146832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2023 19 March 2024 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 19 March 2024 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2022 09 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 09 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2020 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required