BOLIVIA CLASICA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bolivia Clasica Ltd. covers travel expenses for musicians and teachers traveling to Bolivia to work and perform at the BC music school in La Paz. It provides scholarships for Bolivian talents accepted to major institutions. It helps cover maintenance for the music school spaces in Bolivia, the acquisition of musical instruments, administrators and music teachers salaries, and promotional needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Bolivia
Governance
- 19 November 2012: Standard registration
- BOLIVIA CLASICA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANA-MARIA UTE VERA | Chair | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jose Maria Linares | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SANJAY AMIR ABDUL NAZERALI | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.74k | £400 | £9.09k | £4.78k | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.19k | £1.93k | £5.68k | £6.32k | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MUSIC, ART AND CULTURE IN BOLIVIA INCLUDING RUNNING CONCERTS AND FESTIVALS (INCLUDING FUNDRAISING EVENTS) FUNDING TRAINING INITIATIVES AND THE PROVISION OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND ANY OTHER REQUIREMENTS TO SUPPORT BOLIVIAN MUSICIANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 St. John's Villas
London
N19 3EG
- Phone:
- 07813021950
- Email:
- info@boliviaclasica.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window