Financial history JUNCTION 13 EASTLEIGH

Charity number: 1146633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £119.51k £102.45k £145.79k £147.37k £278.66k
Total expenditure £120.28k £109.09k £126.80k £125.44k £160.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A