Trustees JUNCTION 13 EASTLEIGH

Charity number: 1146633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Jane Mullins Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Shaun Alan Burrows Trustee 27 June 2022
None on record
Jonathan David Walter Trustee 20 October 2015
None on record
Neil Leslie Chambers Trustee 03 November 2013
None on record
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES JANUARY Trustee 14 May 2013
None on record
DAVID COLIN LOCKYER Trustee 27 March 2012
None on record