Accounts and annual returns WINDSOR GREYS JUBILEE APPEAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1147486
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2015 02 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 13 March 2014 10 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 March 2014 24 November 2014 On Time
Annual return 13 March 2013 17 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 March 2013 16 January 2014 3 days late