Financial history THE LIBERAL CATHOLIC CHURCH GRAIL COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1156934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £61.66k £45.69k £62.29k £33.41k £34.31k
Total expenditure £53.72k £45.26k £61.77k £43.76k £23.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A