CHARLOTTE'S TANDEMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charlotte's Tandems lends tandems to people with disabilities for free, so that they can enjoy the wonders of cycling. Full details of our tandems (and trailer bikes) their location and availability can be found on our website, CharlottesTandems.co.uk. The site also has details of our current and past borrowers, which makes interesting reading. We also have an active Facebook Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHERINE ANNE REEVES BA, MED | Chair | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Boxer | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Dowson | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Saunders | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Callum James Rush | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DR EDWARD ALEXANDER REEVES BENG, PHD | Trustee | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2020 | 03/04/2021 | 03/04/2022 | 03/04/2023 | 03/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52k | £3.09k | £1.86k | £1.40k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £537 | £6.10k | £1.97k | £1.87k | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 April 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE UNABLE TO RIDE A BIKE SAFELY BY THEMSELVES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE HIRE OF TANDEM CYCLES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knapp Farm House
Knapp Lane
Coaley
DURSLEY
GL11 5AR
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
CharlottesTandems.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window