Financial history AT-TAQWA CENTRE (BIRMINGHAM)

Charity number: 1146620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.91k £74.67k £74.39k £78.03k £90.58k
Total expenditure £51.23k £44.38k £48.05k £52.94k £60.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £34.83k £16.06k N/A N/A