Financial history CVS BRENT

Charity number: 1147186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £294.77k £356.39k £715.70k £524.43k £324.34k
Total expenditure £407.09k £318.91k £679.61k £386.47k £414.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £80.00k N/A
Income from government grants £81.00k N/A £257.99k N/A £194.50k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £12.64k £25.50k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £703.06k £382.79k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £116.14k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £679.61k £378.07k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £8.40k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.60k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A