THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD, MIDDLETON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's duties and obligations are set out in the Parochial Church Councils (Powers) Measure 1956 (as amended). The PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the Rector and Assistant Clergy in promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rochdale
Governance
- 11 May 2012: Previously excepted registration
- ST LEONARD'S PCC, MIDDLETON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alison Margaret Bailie | Chair | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Clarke | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Crowther | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev PHILIP JOHN RAWLINGS | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Gordon Leslie James Jennings | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Woolley | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Connell | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jennings | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JOAN SWAILES | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY MARGARET TAYLOR | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN HAMNETT | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVD FREDA JACKSON | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EDWARD BROOKS | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
KAREN HAMNETT | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHARLES SLIM | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH SLIM BED TCERT | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £327.25k | £89.21k | £72.88k | £86.55k | £361.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £470.10k | £120.29k | £59.73k | £70.02k | £98.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 WOODLANDS WAY
MIDDLETON
MANCHESTER
M24 1WL
- Phone:
- 01616530993
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window