MIGRANT LEGAL ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable: 1.The relief of poverty/financial hardship and ending social exclusion of those whose immigration status is unresolved. 2. British and foreign nationals and asylum seekers to have their human rights recognised in accordance with British and EU law and under the UN Conventions. 3. Persons who have been trafficked to the UK by the provision of legal advice and representation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £55,350 from 2 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2013: Standard registration
- AFRO-ASIAN ADVISORY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunil Lakhani | Chair | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bina Manilal Monji | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lili Negahbani | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chandrakant Vallabhbhai Patel | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bim Evasdotter Wagner | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.38k | £242.36k | £217.26k | £184.15k | £174.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.48k | £231.41k | £198.50k | £218.29k | £174.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £46.41k | £43.32k | £63.87k | £73.91k | £55.35k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2023 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2023 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/11/2014
Charitable objects
1)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PERSONS WHOSE IMMIGRATION STATUS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM REMAINS UNRESOLVED, BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ADVOCACY SERVICES RELATING TO IMMIGRATION, REFUGEE AND/OR NATIONALITY LAW. 2) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS AND UNITED KINGDOM LAW) BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ADVOCACY SERVICES AS A MEANS OF: - RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; - ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. 3) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR UNRESOLVED IMMIGRATION STATUS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ADVOCACY SERVICES RELATING TO IMMIGRATION, REFUGEE AND/OR NATIONALITY LAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Migrant Legal Action
53 Addington Square
LONDON
SE5 7LB
- Phone:
- 02077010141
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window