BALLARD YOUTH ACTIVITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide grants to youth clubs in Plymouth and surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 05 December 2012: Standard registration
- BYAT (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Charlotte Carlyle | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Veysey Bray | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Bharat Bhushan Patel | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Mavin | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
AUBREY F CURTIS CPFA | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEREK MACKINEM | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DONALD BARRY ALFRED NUTTALL | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.25k | £13.63k | £15.37k | £17.66k | £21.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.62k | £27.71k | £35.82k | £40.09k | £38.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/11/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF YOUTH CENTRES AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; AND (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Beaufort House
Mariners Court
Lower Street
Plymouth
PL4 0BS
- Phone:
- 01752604036
- Email:
- aubreyfcurtis@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window