THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST FAITH'S LEE ON THE SOLENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH. Funding Rainbow Toddlers who range from new born babies to pre-school children; Cuppa and Company a support group for anyone who has experienced loss and/or change; Knit and Natter -a group for people who are able to knit, crochet or sew and make blankets for the homeless and premature babies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 December 2012: Previously excepted registration
- ST FAITH'S LEE ON THE SOLENT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev'd Dr Paul Chamberlain | Chair | 13 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Kayleigh Ledwith | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Simkin | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Ian Hamilton | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven McIntyre | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Alvarez | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Andreas Peter Moritz | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Erica Anne Wilkie | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Brammall | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roland Jeremy Rogers | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy-Jane Fulton | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Dawson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Vann | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael James | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Commander MICHAEL SHRIVES MA | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD ADRIAN ROOK | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Brian Mansbridge MNI MBE | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Luke William Marshall | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Dean | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.45k | £187.05k | £234.88k | £270.82k | £300.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.15k | £248.94k | £277.50k | £302.04k | £311.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Faiths Church
Victoria Square
LEE-ON-THE-SOLENT
PO13 9NF
- Phone:
- 023 9255 6445
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window