THE CHRISTIAN CENTRE FOR GAMBLING REHABILITATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently the Charity operates a walk-in centre to help gamblers and their families through the Christian faith to relieve suffering and distress caused by gambling dependency and ultimately to stop gambling. Services are free, including counselling, fellowship groups, themed studies, Bible study and prayer, and debt management support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 May 2012: Standard registration
- 23 January 2019: Funds received from 1083061 THE CHRISTIAN CENTRE FOR GAMBLING REHABILITATION
- CCGR LIMITED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shiu Kong Daniel LAI | Chair | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tsz Fok | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivian Kei Ying Lee | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hing Bun Lok | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bernard Kin Cheung Chan | Trustee | 21 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIU HING TSE | Trustee | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mo Ling Maureen WONG | Trustee | 24 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.96k | £24.69k | £24.96k | £42.94k | £39.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.38k | £23.93k | £44.08k | £55.35k | £47.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JAN 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"): THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF THOSE INDIVIDUALS WITH A GAMBLING DEPENDENCY IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58A Birkenhead Street
London
WC1H 8BW
- Phone:
- 02078338626
- Email:
- admin@ccgr.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window