Accounts and annual returns RCCG VICTORY CENTRE FOR ALL NATIONS, LINCOLN

Charity number: 1147692
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 10 August 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 10 August 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 10 August 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 10 August 2022 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window