NEWARK & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As in Section 5 of the original document PLUS: Newark & District U3A currently operates 40 groups within its organisation, all of which are autonomous but are managed according to the Aims & Principles of the Third Age Trust in that they are self financing and maintain a break-even policy of financial management
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 29 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret George | Chair | 14 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Anita Smith | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Smith | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Rowden-Allen | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Newton | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE WRIGHT | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Eileen Aldridge | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain McGrath | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lindsay McGrath | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Colin Harcus | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.78k | £4.81k | £8.70k | £15.29k | £9.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.55k | £4.92k | £6.30k | £13.84k | £7.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 JUN 2018 as amended on 10 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Cambridge Meadows
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG24 2GU
- Phone:
- 07398 171075
- Email:
- u3anewark.charity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window