CASTLE EDUCATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1146738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Company is a none profit making Company whose objects are the advancement in education and training throughout the world, and the Relief of Poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £185,726
Total expenditure: £64,398

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Haringey
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 April 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON ATKINS Chair 25 March 2012
None on record
MORRIS GOLDBERG Trustee 25 March 2012
None on record
YAAQOV GOLDBERG Trustee 25 March 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £36.39k £50.55k £39.44k £56.78k £185.73k
Total expenditure £34.78k £56.89k £31.19k £48.23k £64.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 26 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 31 July 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 September 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 September 2020 49 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
110 Castlewood Road
LONDON
N15 6BE
Phone:
02088000088
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available