KIRKOSWALD CHURCH INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community building used by surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 18 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDSAY GAIL LITTLE | Chair | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
April Farish | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Chubb | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Morgan | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Morgan | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Tomlinson | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR ALEX MITCHELL | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL PULLAN | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATIE RAINE | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ELIZABETH BOWMAN | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.65k | £15.15k | £20.97k | £5.50k | £12.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.38k | £3.53k | £4.36k | £7.73k | £46.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/11/1992 AS AMENDED BY AGREEMENT MADE UNDER THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS VALIDATION ACT 1954 15/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO BE USED OR LET FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES THAT IS TO SAY: FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY RELIGIOUS PURPOSE IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR FOR ANY CLASSES CONCERTS MEETINGS LECTURE OR RECREATIONS OF A SECULAR CHARACTER HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL INTELLECTUAL MORAL OR SOCIAL WANTS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KIRKOSWALD AND OF THE NEIGHBOURING POPULATION. IN THIS CONTEXT, “ANY RELIGIOUS PURPOSE IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND” IS PROPERLY INTERPRETED AS MEANING “THE PROMOTION OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND TEACHING OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.” "CLASSES CONCERTS MEETINGS LECTURE OR RECREATIONS OF A SECULAR CHARACTER HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL INTELLECTUAL MORAL OR SOCIAL WANTS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KIRKOSWALD AND OF THE NEIGHBOURING POPULATION” DESCRIBES THE PROVISION OF THE BUILDING AS A FACILITY FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND THE NEIGHBOURING POPULATION AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KIRKOSWALD AND OF THE NEIGHBOURING POPULATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ennerdale
Cannerheugh
Renwick
PENRITH
CA10 1LA
- Phone:
- 07734953055
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window