THE ST CHAD'S CENTRE TRUST COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- THE DESIGN, CONSTRUCTION A NEW COMMUNITY AND PARISH CENTRE TO BE CALLED THE ST CHAD?S CENTRE AT CHURCH HILL, BISHOP?S TACHBROOK, WARWICKSHIRE. - THE MANAGEMENT, OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF BISHOPS TACHBROOK AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY AND OTHER CHARITIES AND NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS OPERATING WITHIN SUCH LOCALITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samatha Morle | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dale Duffy | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Murphy | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Brian Jordan | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Cobham-Lowe OBE | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WATT | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.46k | £23.13k | £28.74k | £20.00k | £24.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.68k | £16.58k | £31.23k | £18.47k | £30.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.67k | £11.63k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/07/2012
Charitable objects
2.1 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BISHOP'S TACHBROOK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS; 2.2 SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BY MAKING DONATIONS TO CHARITIES WHO ARE REGULAR USERS OF THE CENTRE FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THEIR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Chad's Centre
Church Hill
Bishop's Tachbrook
Leamington Spa
Warwickshire
CV33 9RJ
- Phone:
- 07484278110
- Email:
- stchadscentrebt@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window