Financial history ORPHANS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1146781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £87.59k £17.54k £52.26k £69.78k £35.24k
Total expenditure £86.21k £31.43k £43.76k £67.76k £40.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A