ORPHANS INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In Romania the charity provides orphanages & poor communities with: funds, food, clothes, medication, helps fund building homes & bought an apartment to house girls from an orphanage on a program to help them become independent. In the Democratic Republic of Congo the charity has been working on an Education programme to assist children ranging from 5-19 years in different areas of the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Congo
- Romania
Governance
- 04 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNABEL STONER LLB | Chair | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DOUGLAS WARNER FCA | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE JOAN STONER | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.59k | £17.54k | £52.26k | £69.78k | £35.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.21k | £31.43k | £43.76k | £67.76k | £40.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT FOR ORPHANS AND IMPOVERISHED FAMILIES PRINCIPALLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN ROMANIA AND THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO; 2) TO AID THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG ADULTS IN THEIR POST-ORPHANAGE YEARS PRINCIPALLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN ROMANIA; 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO AN EDUCATION PROGRAMME PRINCIPALLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO; AND 4) TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 PALMEIRA MANSIONS
CHURCH ROAD
HOVE
EAST SUSSEX
BN3 6GN
- Phone:
- 07720695155
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window