IRCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity carries out activities to advance the education of the public. The charity publishes data arising from surveys and investigation it carries out on behalf of NGOs. The charity also develops and implements training programmes in collaboration with educational establishments. The charity ceased activities on 31 October 2013. The charity is liaising with the commission to be wound up.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Argentina
- Brazil
- Burma
- Cambodia
- China
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- India
- Iran
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Russia
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- United States
- Vietnam
Governance
- 06 June 2012: Standard registration
- 21 October 2015: Removed (Removed by application)
- IRCE (Working name)
- INTERMEDIA RESEARCH AND CONSULTING EUROPE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £764.27k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £764.27k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £207.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £556.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £737.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.49k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 06 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 22 September 2014 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | 25 September 2014 | 25 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL BY CARRYING OUT EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND CONDUCTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO (I) ENCOURAGING, FOSTERING AND CONDUCTING SURVEYS, INVESTIGATIONS AND RESEARCH STUDIES REGARDING INTERNATIONAL MEDIA AND COMMUNICATIONS, MARKETS AND POPULATIONS, (II) PUBLISHING AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION AND DATA ARISING FROM SUCH SURVEYS, INVESTIGATIONS AND RESEARCH, (III) CONDUCTING SURVEYS, INVESTIGATIONS AND RESEARCH ON BEHALF OF NON-GOVERNMENTAL EUROPEAN ORGANISATIONS AND (IV) DEVELOPING AND IMPLEMENTING CAPACITY STRENGTHENING TRAINING PROGRAMMES IN COLLABORATION WITH EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, RESEARCH INSTITUTIONS AND ORGANISATIONS ON A GLOBAL BASIS TO PROVIDE TRAINING IN RESEARCH SKILLS AND TECHNIQUES WITH A FOCUS ON SOCIAL RESEARCH SKILLS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window