Financial history ABLE 2 ACHIEVE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1148173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £323.28k £323.28k £293.03k £419.29k £381.65k
Total expenditure £322.39k £322.39k £268.34k £459.53k £383.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.28k