Young People's Shop Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides information, advice, support and counselling for young people aged 13-25 within the Chichester district. Its provision is free, confidential and offered independently from other services. The project aims to make fully accessible for all young people the support they need to enable them to become fully participative members of the community and active, independent citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,995 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 31 August 2012: Standard registration
- CHICHESTER INFORMATION SHOP FOR YOUNG PEOPLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD BENTLEY DASHWOOD LANG | Chair | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Macfarlane | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Cordery | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Campbell | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Claire Green | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Ruth Doyle | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Charis Felicity Pickford | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.78k | £110.01k | £198.86k | £169.66k | £258.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.72k | £83.35k | £139.59k | £218.93k | £206.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.92k | £14.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2012 as amended on 09 Sep 2019 as amended on 15 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF YOUNG PEOPLE (AGED 13-30) IN CHICESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Young People's Shop
29 South Street
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO19 1EL
- Phone:
- 01243 839093
- Email:
- contact@yps-south.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window