Financial history CHANGING LIVES CENTRE

Charity number: 1147382
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £20.50k £21.10k £10.10k £15.65k £14.40k
Total expenditure £14.23k £16.46k £9.69k £12.22k £12.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A