Financial history PIG SHED TRUST

Charity number: 1146739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £768.48k £1.58m £1.28m £955.10k £925.13k
Total expenditure £60.41k £760.53k £755.68k £866.09k £984.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £625.00k £1.38m £500.00k £510.00k £500.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £200.60k £780.01k £440.23k £343.53k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £768 £768 £768
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £143.48k £326 £343 £4.10k £80.83k
Income - Other £0 £640 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £58.85k £760.53k £55.05k £405.01k £76.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.56k £0 £340.67k £387.92k £343.58k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £9.08k £20.63k £8.22k £12.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £64.26k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £8.23k £7.74k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £359.96k £73.16k £564.71k