Financial history POP 'N' GROW

Charity number: 1148627
Charity reporting is overdue by 648 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £4.68k £1.61k £1.86k £1.62k £1.68k
Total expenditure £9.25k £7.78k £2.98k £1.56k £653
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A