FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of St.Joseph's are a fundraising group,set up for the benefit of residents and day people who use St.Josephs adult services.The funds raised are to provide additional amenities and opportunities that contribute to their quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 05 July 1974: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL FOR HANDICAPPED CHILDREN, FRESHFIELD (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Mosses | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.11k | £4.86k | £5.15k | £6.04k | £27.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.44k | £4.45k | £3.28k | £6.56k | £5.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 08 December 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 08 December 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 17 December 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 17 December 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE, RELIEVE AND ASSIST INDIVIDUALS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES RESIDENT AT ST. JOSEPH'S NURSING HOME, FRESHFIELD, FORMBY, LIVERPOOL, BY PROVIDING FUNDS FOR AMENITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOSEPHS NURSING HOME
BLUNDELL AVENUE
FORMBY
LIVERPOOL
L37 1PH
- Phone:
- 01704872132
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window