Financial history TEEN ENTERPRISE UK

Charity number: 1148955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £8.71k £5.20k £36.55k £38.99k £82.33k
Total expenditure £6.38k £7.00k £15.99k £49.03k £75.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.10k