MILFORD ON SEA ARTS AND MUSIC FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation of a four day Arts and Music Festival based around the Village Green at Milford on Sea. Further events are arranged around the village during the Festival period including play readings, music and a film.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 July 2012: Standard registration
- 23 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.45k | £22.44k | £27.40k | £27.62k | £21.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.48k | £22.85k | £23.30k | £22.33k | £25.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 02 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 25 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 25 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 10 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 10 March 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 27 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ARTS, MUSIC AND CULTURE IN ALL ASPECTS AND BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 3.2 TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window