Accounts and annual returns NORTH MANCHESTER PARTNERSHIP OF SCHOOLS

Charity Number: 1149566
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 04 August 2016 35 days late
Annual return 31 August 2014 28 July 2015 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 20 May 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2013 22 July 2014 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 30 June 2014 On Time