Accounts and annual returns NETWORK COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1147371
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2024 08 March 2025 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2023 20 February 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Not Required