FIRST STEPS SPONSORSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity operates in Tamale, Ghana and provides funding for young females to attend primary and secondary schools. The sponsorship money comes from international sponsors and is collected annually by the trustees in the UK. An amount to cover the cost of uniforms, books, exam fees and extra lessons is sent to the Ghanaian manager every month. He distributes it directly to the schools involved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ghana
Governance
- 17 July 2012: Standard registration
- 19 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2014 | 01/01/2015 | 01/01/2016 | 01/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.04k | £3.78k | £1.30k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.11k | £2.65k | £1.23k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2017 | 20 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2016 | 18 November 2016 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2015 | 29 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2014 | 20 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 APR 2012
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN STATE SCHOOL EDUCATION AND APPRENTICESHIP PLACEMENTS BY PROVIDING A SPONSORSHIP TO SCHOOL AND WORK SCHEME. (II) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE LEARNING BY PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND BACKGROUNDS IN THE WIDER TAMALE COMMUNITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window