THE MARRIAGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conducting and publishing research into couple relationships; raising awareness of the risks of unstable relationships; addressing myths and misperceptions which hinder the formation of more stable relationships; promoting improved access to relationships education; working with existing providers of couple relationship support to enable their work to have greater impact;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 January 2013: Standard registration
- 18 January 2024: Funds received from 1101587 FAMILY MATTERS INSTITUTE
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR PAUL JAMES DUKE COLERIDGE KT. | Chair | 05 April 2012 |
|
|||||||
Lady Elinor Kaitrin Bailey | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Alice Evelina Coleridge | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Edgar Taylor-Cummings | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Andrea Maria Taylor-Cummings | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Pamela Caroline Neild Collis | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||
WILLIAM PAUL HUGH DUKE COLERIDGE | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.18k | £75.84k | £100.94k | £94.79k | £98.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.17k | £71.05k | £94.40k | £100.98k | £92.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/01/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN, AND TO PREVENT HARDSHIP POVERTY AND DISTRESS, BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE MEANS BY WHICH SUCCESSFUL RELATIONSHIPS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MARRIED RELATIONSHIPS) CAN BE DEVELOPED AND STRENGTHENED AND THE BREAKDOWN OF RELATIONSHIPS AVOIDED. 2. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCCESSFUL RELATIONSHIPS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MARRIED RELATIONSHIPS) AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF 3. TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVENESS AND EFFICIENCY OF CHARITIES CONCERNED WITH THE CREATION AND MAINTENANCE OF SUCCESSFUL RELATIONSHIPS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MARRIED RELATIONSHIPS), FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ORGANISING CONFERENCES AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF RELEVANT RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 3014
ROMFORD
RM7 1TX
- Phone:
- 07790947349
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window