HOUSE OF GRACE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1148482
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The activities of the charity includes; 1.Organising church services 2.Organising prayer meetings 3.Evangelising through seminars and lectures

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £24,124
Total expenditure: £22,157

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 August 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOG (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRACE OLUFUNMILAYO JOHNSON BSC Trustee 20 April 2012
None on record
FELA THEO LUFADEJU Trustee 20 April 2012
None on record
DIANA ASANTE Trustee 20 April 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.96k £6.23k £1.05k £6.78k £24.12k
Total expenditure £1.46k £7.72k £1.05k £5.04k £22.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 November 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 June 2024 233 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 June 2024 598 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
House of Grace
62D Stamford Hill
LONDON
N16 6XS
Phone:
07984646871
Website:

No information available