Financial history OPEN DOOR CHURCH (KETTERING)

Charity number: 1147542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £200.59k £147.44k £145.44k £163.24k £170.07k
Total expenditure £212.48k £145.49k £155.35k £178.37k £170.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.31k £4.47k N/A N/A