OPEN DOOR CHURCH (KETTERING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a family of people who meet together to worship Jesus Christ, have fun and serve the community around us. We welcome everyone who wants to come and join with us or just come and have a look at who we are and what we do. Sundays we meet at 10.30am in the eden centre in Kettering and our offices and other activities are there too during the week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
94 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 31 May 2012: Standard registration
- OPEN DOOR CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN NUNN | Chair | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Glover | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Toby Widdicombe | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Odo Akaji | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Cockburn | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.59k | £147.44k | £145.44k | £163.24k | £170.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.48k | £145.49k | £155.35k | £178.37k | £170.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.31k | £4.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/05/2012
Charitable objects
1.1.1 TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY IN KETTERING AND ELSEWHERE, BY ANY MEANS OR MEDIUM THAT IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINE SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE. 1.1.2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF SICKNESS OR AGE OR SOME OTHER REASON 1.1.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, BOTH GENERAL AND VOCATIONAL, FOR CHILDREN OR ADULTS BUT ALWAYS WITHIN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 1.1.4 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eden Centre
21 Montagu Street
KETTERING
NN16 8XG
- Phone:
- 01536484800
- Email:
- info@opendoorchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window