Accounts and annual returns THE4CS - CLIMATE CHANGE COMMUNITY CHAMPIONS

Charity Number: 1148866
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2018 19 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 23 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 February 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2016 22 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 January 2017 On Time