Financial history BIBLE CHURCH OF GOD'S PRAISE( WELL OF PRAISE)

Charity number: 1147393
Charity reporting is up to date (328 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £19.46k £17.18k £11.70k £10.33k £12.89k
Total expenditure £17.65k £16.76k £8.95k £8.81k £13.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A