Accounts and annual returns THE LAST REFUGE ARTS

Charity number: 1148210
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2014 21 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 11 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 30 January 2014 On Time