HIANA (HOPE IN A NEW AGE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve individuals(youth/kids)who are in conditions of need,hardship,young offenders,orphaned,uneducated,affected by war,religious extremism,molestation,premature pregnancy,child birth and abortion.Assisting through provision of education,training,healthcare projects and all necessary support designed to enable them to live their lives unaffected by their background and become self-sufficient.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Albania
- Germany
- Ghana
- Togo
Governance
- 29 May 2012: Standard registration
- NO (Working name)
- WMC & BBG (WORLD MISSION COMPASSION & BEAUTY BEHIND GOSPEL) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Clarke | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Liburd | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Boniface Lumumba | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL CALLOW | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev BERNARD KORD | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.36k | £408.24k | £431.86k | £343.53k | £220.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £243.40k | £360.84k | £420.29k | £316.77k | £222.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2012
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE INDIVIDUALS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED, WIDOWED, ORPHANED OR SICK TO ASSIST LESSENING THE MISERY CAUSED. ASSISTING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. TO EQUIP AND EMPOWER THE LESS FORTUNATE INTO ACHIEVING A SUSTAINABLE INCOME. 2.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH WORLD EVANGELISM MISSIONS AND VARIOUS OUTREACH PROGRAMMES. HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, CHRISTIAN FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING CHRISTIAN LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. PROVIDING INSIGHT INTO THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO THOSE DESIRING AND SEEKING SPIRITUAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hiana House
141 Tat Bank Road
Oldbury
Birmingham
West Midlands
B69 4NH
- Phone:
- 01215520116
- Email:
- hiana@hiana.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window