Financial history Friends of Burngreave Cemetery and Chapels

Charity number: 1147669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £469 £420 £1.09k £436 £1.01k
Total expenditure £721 £562 £1.60k £466 £948
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A