THE HEREFORDSHIRE TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides news paper recordings of local news for the visually impaired and blind people of the County
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 19 April 1974: Standard registration
- HEREFORDSHIRE TALKING NEWS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laetitia Westerman | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Chloe Manson | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Srevens | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Anne Penson | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janet Adele Bowler | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Barrat | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Wilson | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLEN CAWDEARY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.87k | £923 | £371 | £394 | £1.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.24k | £879 | £2.61k | £3.37k | £283 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 3 0CTOBER 1973 AND REVISED 12 DECEMBER 1973, AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 1994, AS AMENDED 9 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF AUDIO RECORDINGS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mortimer House Properties
Mortimer House
Holmer Road
HEREFORD
HR4 9TA
- Phone:
- 01981241379
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window