THE GLIDING HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim is to educate the public about the heritage of gliding in the UK through the development and operation of a heritage centre. The main activities are to display vintage gliders and give presentations to the members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 September 2012: Standard registration
- GHC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ANTHONY ROBERT NEWBERY | Chair | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Graham Edward Garnett | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
GARY DAVID PULLEN | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN PAUL BEN-DAVID | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
GLYN BRADNEY | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.82k | £27.70k | £43.40k | £35.23k | £78.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.71k | £20.00k | £40.49k | £38.55k | £38.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAR 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF GLIDING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVSION OF A HERITAGE CENTRE AND THE PRESERVATION OF HSITORICAL GLIDERS, ARTEFACTS AND RECORDS WHICH CAN BE DSIPLAYED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Lasham Gliding Society
The Avenue
Lasham Airfield
Alton
Hampshire
GU34 5SS
- Phone:
- 01252614906
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window