MISS ELIZABETH MOORE
Charity Number: 502788
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 31 October 1973: Standard registration
- 15 December 2003: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT PPR 16 AUGUST 1912 AS AMENDED ON 23 JULY 2002 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SERVICES OF THE CHURCH, PAYMENT OF AN ASSISTANT CURATE OR IN THE UPKEEP OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT BIRMINGHAM 16 AUGUST 1918
Charitable objects
FOR PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH SERVICES OF THE CHURCH, PAYMENT OF AN ASSISTANT CURATE, OR IN THE UPKEEP OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS
Registration history
- 31 October 1973 : Standard registration
- 15 December 2003 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.